ND 1418 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of statements of interests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of statements of interests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseSigned by Governor 04/17
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-10SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 5
2017-04-07HouseConcurred
2017-03-30HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 5
2017-03-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 7
2017-02-01HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 1
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback