ND 1417 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend subsection? 1 of section? 16.1-03-03, subsection? 2 of section 16.1-03-21, subsection? 2 of section 16.1-05-03, and sections 16.1-11-30 and 16.1-11-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to primary elections, placement on ballots, nominations of candidates, and political party organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary elections, placement on ballots, nominations of candidates, and political party organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 69
2017-02-20HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1
2017-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback