ND 1416 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 61-21-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of cleaning out and repairing of drain.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of cleaning out and repairing of drain.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 8 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 82
2017-02-17HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-08HouseRereferred to Agriculture
2017-02-06HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback