ND HB1415 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for Fargo flood control project funding requirements; and to provide legislative intent.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for Fargo flood control project funding requirements; and to provide legislative intent.
Sponsors
Rep. Al Carlson [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Wesley Belter [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Kyle Davison [R] |
Sen. Tim Flakoll [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 69 |
2015-04-20 | House | Concurred |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 4 |
2015-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2015-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |