ND HB1414 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Dever, Lyson A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 39-04-10.14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the issuance of special plates for surviving family members of fallen members of the United States military.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Dever, Lyson A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 39-04-10.14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the issuance of special plates for surviving family members of fallen members of the United States military.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Dosch [R] | Rep. Bette Grande [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-13 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-11 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Request return from committee | |
2009-03-05 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation | |
2009-02-11 | Received from House | |
2009-02-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1414.html |