ND 1410 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 25-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting department of human services from substantially burdening the exercise of religion by a patient or resident under the department's care; to amend and reenact sections 12-44.1-14 and 12-47-26, subsection 12 of section 23-01-05, and section 37-17.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting a correctional facility or facility under the control of the department of corrections and rehabilitation from substantially burdening the exercise of religion by an offender in the facility's custody, the state health officer's authority, and the governor's authority during a declared disaster or emergency; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting a correctional facility or facility under the control of the department of corrections and rehabilitation from substantially burdening the exercise of religion by an offender in the facility's custody, the state health officer's authority, and the governor's authority during a declared disaster or emergency; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-16HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-15SenateSigned by President
2021-04-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10
2021-04-14HouseConcurred
2021-04-01HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-31SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2021-03-31SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-29SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 10
2021-02-24HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-23HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 2 3
2021-02-23HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2021-02-19HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2
2021-02-11HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2021-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1410.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0346-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0346-03002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0346-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0346-03003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0346-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0346-09000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0346-10000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0346-11000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-35.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-56.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-65.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback