ND HB1409 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 12 of section 57-38-01 and section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to income taxes of individuals, estates, and trusts; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Income taxes of individuals, estates, and trusts; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70 |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1409.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0322-03000.pdf |