ND HB1406 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-06-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an application for an operator's license.
Title
An application for an operator's license.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Simons [R] | Rep. Cole Christensen [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Sen. Jason Heitkamp [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Governor 03/17 |
2021-03-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 32 nays 14 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 18 |
2021-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |