ND HB1406 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-52.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employee uniform group health insurance benefits; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Public employee uniform group health insurance benefits; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Al Carlson [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 13, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 17 0 4 |
2017-01-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back, do pass 11 2 1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |