ND 1404 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a peace officer student loan forgiveness program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A peace officer student loan forgiveness program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76
2021-02-02HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback