ND HB1404 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT create and enact a new section to chapter 24-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to designating state highway 22 as the veterans memorial highway; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Designating state highway 22 as the veterans memorial highway; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] |
Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |