ND 1403 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-52.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employee health benefits transparency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employee health benefits transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseSigned by Governor 04/26
2017-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-24SenateSigned by President
2017-04-20SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-20SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2017-04-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2017-04-20HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-20HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2017-04-10HouseAppoint Rep. Kasper to replace Rep. Louser on conference committee
2017-04-05SenateConference committee appointed J. Lee Anderson Heckaman
2017-04-04HouseConference committee appointed D. Ruby Louser Boschee
2017-04-04HouseRefused to concur
2017-03-30HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 37 nays 10
2017-03-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2017-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2017-02-02HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-01HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-17HouseRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2017-01-17HouseRequest return from committee
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback