ND 1401 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 23.1-11-01, 23.1-11-05, 23.1-11-06, and 23.1-11-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to monitoring and regulation of special waste in ground water; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Monitoring and regulation of special waste in ground water; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 78
2021-02-05HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 1 2
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback