ND 1400 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 4.1-31-05.1 and a new section to chapter 19-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to misrepresenting nonmeat as a meat food product; to amend and reenact section 4.1-31-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of meat and the nomenclature of edible meat products; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of meat and the nomenclature of edible meat products; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseSigned by Governor 03/12
2019-03-07HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-06SenateSigned by President
2019-03-05HouseReturned to House
2019-03-04SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
2019-03-01SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 2
2019-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2019-02-11SenateReceived from House
2019-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 1
2019-02-05HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback