ND HB1400 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-44.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to equal pay certificates for state contracts.
Title
Equal pay certificates for state contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Schneider [D] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] |
Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 94 |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |