ND HB1399 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 39-05-20.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a certificate of collector's title; and to provide a penalty.
Title
A certificate of collector's title; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Tveit [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 3 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 90 |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |