ND HB1398 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 34-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibitions on political subdivisions regulating paid family leave.
Title
Prohibitions on political subdivisions regulating paid family leave.
Sponsors
Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] |
Rep. Paul Thomas [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Jim Roers [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Signed by Governor 03/16 |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 7 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 14 |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |