ND HB1398 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-03-02, 54-35-16, 54-44.1-07, and 54-44.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to annually reconvened sessions of the legislative assembly.
Title
Annually reconvened sessions of the legislative assembly.
Sponsors
Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Kyle Davison [R] | Sen. John Grabinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 70 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |