ND 1397 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the introduction of bills by executive branch agencies and the judicial branch.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The introduction of bills by executive branch agencies and the judicial branch.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
2017-03-23SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 48 nays 44
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 6 0
2017-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback