ND HB1395 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 14-09-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring evaluations for individuals convicted of child abuse; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Requiring evaluations for individuals convicted of child abuse; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Austen Schauer [R] | Rep. Mary Adams [D] | Rep. Ruth Buffalo [D] | Rep. Lauriebeth Hager [D] |
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2019-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 6 |
2019-04-15 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-05 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 0 2 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 11 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 8 2 |
2019-02-06 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |