ND HB1394 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for costs related to COVID-19 and other services; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for costs related to COVID-19 and other services; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] |
Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-16 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |