ND HB1393 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 12.1-17-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to domestic violence; to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 12-60-16.4, section 12.1-17-01, subsection 6 of section 12.1-17-07.1, sections 12.1-17-13 and 12.1-32-07, and subsection 3 of section 12.1-38-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to simple assault; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Simple assault; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 19 |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2019-04-23 | House | Reconsidered |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Appoint Rep. Vetter to replace Rep. Paulson on conference committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Dwyer Myrdal Bakke |
2019-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Roers Jones Paulson Simons |
2019-04-15 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-15 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 0 2 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 6 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |