ND HB1392 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 44-04-18.29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to confidentiality of records received by the board of university and school lands; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Confidentiality of records received by the board of university and school lands; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Greg Westlind [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2019-03-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 2 |
2019-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |