ND 1391 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading, failed, lacks two-thirds majority yeas 25 nays 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 19-24.1-24.1 and a new subsection to section 19-24.1-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulating edible medical marijuana products; to amend and reenact section 19-24.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions relating to medical marijuana products; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions relating to medical marijuana products; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading, failed, lacks two-thirds majority yeas 25 nays 22
2021-03-24SenateReported back without recommendation 5 1 0
2021-03-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-19SenateReceived from House
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 31, Emergency clause carried
2021-02-10HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 0
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback