ND HB1391 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 26.1-26.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of self-service storage insurance.
Title
Regulation of self-service storage insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-22 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2 |
2019-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |