ND 1390 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
Pending: Joint Political Subdivisions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of training for election workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of training for election workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-10SenateReceived from House
2021-02-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 29
2021-02-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-02HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
2021-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback