ND 1389 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to parental directives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental directives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseSigned by Governor 04/18
2017-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-17SenateSigned by President
2017-04-14SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-04-14SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-12SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 12
2017-04-12HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-10HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-04SenateConference committee appointed Schaible Kannianen Oban
2017-03-31HouseConference committee appointed Rich S. Becker Oliver Mock
2017-03-31HouseRefused to concur
2017-03-30HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-03-28HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-27SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-03-27SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-24SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseEmergency clause failed
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 54 nays 38
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 1
2017-02-13HouseRereferred to Education
2017-02-09HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 1 2
2017-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1389.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0879-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0879-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0879-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0879-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0879-03003a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0879-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0879-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-34.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-55.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-66.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-68.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback