ND 1387 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 12.1-36-01, 29-04-02, and 29-04-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the statute of limitations for prosecuting surgical alteration of the genitals of a female minor, felonies other than murder, and sexual abuse of minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The statute of limitations for prosecuting surgical alteration of the genitals of a female minor, felonies other than murder, and sexual abuse of minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60
2021-02-11HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1
2021-02-03HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback