ND 1386 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 14-02.4-01, 14-02.4-02, 14-02.4-03, 14-02.4-04, 14-02.4-05, 14-02.4-06, 14-02.4-08, and 14-02.4-09, subsection 1 of section 14-02.4-14, sections 14-02.4-15, 14-02.4-16, and 14-02.4-17, subsections 1 and 2 of section 14-02.5-02, sections 14-02.5-03, 14-02.5-04, 14-02.5-05, 14-02.5-07, and 14-02.5-08, subsection 3 of section 14-02.5-10, subsection 11 of section 26.1-04-03, subsection 1 of section 26.1-30.1-01.1, subsection 1 of section 26.1-39-17, subsection 1 of section 26.1-40-11, and sections 26.1-47-04 and 27-09.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibition of discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition of discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-10HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 69
2017-02-09HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback