ND HB1385 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 28-32-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the attorney general review of proposed administrative rules.
Title
The attorney general review of proposed administrative rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Rep. Bill Tveit [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Sen. Mike Wobbema [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 66 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported back without recommendation 13 1 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |