ND HB1385 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-07-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mandatory safety training for school bus drivers.
Title
Mandatory safety training for school bus drivers.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Clayton Fegley [R] | Rep. Daniel Johnston [R] |
Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 8 |
2019-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |