ND 1385 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-07-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mandatory safety training for school bus drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory safety training for school bus drivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseSigned by Governor 03/12
2019-03-07HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-06SenateSigned by President
2019-03-05HouseReturned to House
2019-03-04SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
2019-03-01SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-02-28SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2019-02-15SenateReceived from House
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 8
2019-02-11HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback