ND 1384 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-11-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to duties of the state treasurer; to amend and reenact section 10-15-49 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to abandoned property; and to repeal section 15-02-05.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the administrator of abandoned property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The administrator of abandoned property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
2017-03-13SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 5
2017-01-31HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 1
2017-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback