ND 1381 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 20.1-01-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to interference with the taking of wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interference with the taking of wildlife.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-20HouseSigned by Governor 03/19
2015-03-17HouseSent to Governor
2015-03-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-16SenateSigned by President
2015-03-11HouseReturned to House
2015-03-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2015-03-09SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1
2015-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2015-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2015-02-20SenateReceived from House
2015-02-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2015-02-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
2015-02-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-01-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback