ND 1380 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09.4 and a new section to chapter 21-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a legacy sinking and interest fund and a legacy earnings fund; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 21-10-06 and section 21-10-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to funds invested by the state investment board and legacy fund definitions; to repeal House Bill No. 1038, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, relating to a legislative management legacy fund earnings committee; to provide for a transfer; to create a legislative management legacy fund earnings committee; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A legislative management legacy fund earnings committee; to provide for a transfer; to create a legislative management legacy fund earnings committee; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-29SenateSigned by President
2021-04-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2021-04-29SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-29SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9
2021-04-29HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-29HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-29HouseAppoint Rep. Pollert to replace Rep. Delzer on conference committee
2021-04-26SenateConference committee appointed Sorvaag Bell Heckaman
2021-04-23HouseConference committee appointed Delzer Vigesaa Boe
2021-04-23HouseRefused to concur
2021-04-14HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-13SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-04-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-13SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-03-31SenateCommittee Hearing 03:30
2021-03-29SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-29SenateAmendment adopted
2021-03-26SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 22
2021-02-24HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-23HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 3 2
2021-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1380.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0218-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0218-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0218-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0218-08000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0218-09000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0218-10000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-35.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-64.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-76.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-76.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback