ND HB1380 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 40-22.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to creation of safety and emergency services improvement districts and levy of special assessments against certain property exempt from property taxes for a share of the cost of providing law enforcement, fire, and ambulance service benefiting those properties.
Title
Creation of safety and emergency services improvement districts and levy of special assessments against certain property exempt from property taxes for a share of the cost of providing law enforcement, fire, and ambulance service benefiting those properties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 61 |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |