ND 1377 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-35-03, 43-35-17, and 43-35-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state board of water well contractors and continuing education requirements for water well pump and pitless unit installers; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State board of water well contractors and continuing education requirements for water well pump and pitless unit installers; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/28
2019-03-28HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-27SenateSigned by President
2019-03-26HouseReturned to House
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2019-03-22SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-01-28SenateReceived from House
2019-01-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-01-23HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2019-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback