ND 1376 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and section 54-17-07.13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks for the housing finance agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal history record checks for the housing finance agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseSigned by Governor 03/13
2019-03-12HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-11SenateSigned by President
2019-03-08HouseReturned to House
2019-03-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2019-03-06SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-01-28SenateReceived from House
2019-01-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 20
2019-01-22HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 5 1
2019-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 09:50
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback