ND HB1375 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-09-08, 15.1-09-11, 16.1-11-08, 16.1-11-19, 16.1-11-24, 16.1-12-09, 40-21-06, 40-21-07, and 40-21-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to references to party affiliation in elections.
Title
References to party affiliation in elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 53 |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |