ND 1374 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax deduction for COVID-19 relief benefits; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An income tax deduction for COVID-19 relief benefits; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
2021-03-16SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0
2021-03-03SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-11SenateReceived from House
2021-02-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 62 nays 32
2021-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback