ND 1374 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact sections 61-02-14.3, 61-02-80, 61-02-81, and a new section to chapter 61-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contracts and financial assistance for water projects and duties of the state engineer; and to amend and reenact sections 61-02-01.3, 61-02-01.4, 61-02-02, 61-02-04, 61-02-07, and 61-02-08, subsection 1 of section 61-02-14, and subsection 4 of section 61-02-62 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions of types of financial assistance for water projects and the composition and operation of the state water commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions of types of financial assistance for water projects and the composition and operation of the state water commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseSigned by Governor 04/18
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 8
2017-04-05HouseConcurred
2017-03-30HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 25 nays 22
2017-03-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-03SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-21SenateReceived from House
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 8
2017-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback