ND HB1374 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 007 nays 084
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 007 nays 084
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Krauter, Warner A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to physician education requirements.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Krauter, Warner A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to physician education requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-06 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 007 nays 084 | |
2009-02-04 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1374.html |