ND HB1372 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for the identification of and provision of services to veterans exposed to agent orange.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for the identification of and provision of services to veterans exposed to agent orange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2015-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2015-04-14 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Dever Poolman Marcellais |
2015-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Rohr Seibel Amerman |
2015-04-08 | House | Refused to concur |
2015-04-02 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 1 1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |