ND 1371 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring the state to observe daylight saving time year round; to repeal section 40-01-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to daylight saving time; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Daylight saving time; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 36 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 36 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 56
2021-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-19HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2021-04-15HouseConference committee appointed Pyle Cory M. Nelson
2021-04-15HouseRefused to concur
2021-04-13HouseConference committee report rejected
2021-04-09HouseReported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-07SenateConference committee appointed Heitkamp Kannianen Oban
2021-04-06HouseConference committee appointed Pyle Cory M. Nelson
2021-04-06HouseRefused to concur
2021-03-17HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-16SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 8
2021-03-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-15SenateReceived from House
2021-02-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 57 nays 35
2021-02-05HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 0
2021-02-05HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback