ND HB1370 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 15.1-09-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school board powers and the leasing of real property.
Title
School board powers and the leasing of real property.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. David Richter [R] | Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] |
Sen. Kyle Davison [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |