ND 1369 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 15.1-39 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of an education empowerment program; and to provide an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The establishment of an education empowerment program; and to provide an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
2021-02-12HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-05HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-04HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-15HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback