ND HB1369 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-07-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payments for school bus driver physical examinations.
Title
Payments for school bus driver physical examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |