ND 1369 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact sections 16.1-01-04.1 and 16.1-01-04.2, a new subsection to section 39-06-03.1, and a new subsection to section 39-06-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to identification and residency requirements for electors and identification cards; to amend and reenact sections 16.1-01-04, 16.1-01-12, 16.1-02-09, 16.1-05-07, 16.1-07-06, 16.1-15-08, 16.1-15-19, and 39-06-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to qualifications of electors, responsibilities of election officials before issuing ballots, elector identification requirements, identification cards, and operator's licenses; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualifications of electors, responsibilities of election officials before issuing ballots, elector identification requirements, identification cards, and operator's licenses; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseSigned by Governor 04/24
2017-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-18SenateSigned by President
2017-04-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 10
2017-04-18SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-17SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-14HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
2017-04-12SenateConference committee appointed Davison Meyer Marcellais
2017-04-10HouseConference committee appointed Kasper Louser P. Anderson
2017-04-10HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 37 nays 10
2017-04-03SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-31SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-02HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 16
2017-01-30HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
2017-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback