ND 1368 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Committee Hearing 10:00
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Hearing: Mar 12 @ 10:00 am in Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 51-07-28.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tracking devices on motor vehicles; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tracking devices on motor vehicles; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-02-16SenateReceived from House
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
2021-02-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-15HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback