ND 1368 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-13-06 and 57-13-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county board of equalization appeals of state board of equalization proceedings; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County board of equalization appeals of state board of equalization proceedings; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 41 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-13HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 47
2017-02-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-03HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2017-02-01HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2017-01-31HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2017-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback